Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Shawn McKnight

Bishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1968 Born
28 May 199425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
21 Nov 201749.4AppointedBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
6 Feb 201849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for William Shawn McKnight
Bishop William Shawn McKnight (born ) Bishop of Jefferson City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWichita, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Jefferson City, Diocese of Jefferson City, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jefferson City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2017
  • fn/ob: CB, 21 Nov 2017
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,672

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast