Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert James Carlson

Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1944 BornMinneapolis
23 May 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
19 Nov 198339.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
19 Nov 198339.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Avioccala
11 Jan 198439.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avioccala
13 Jan 199449.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
21 Mar 199550.7SucceededBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
29 Dec 200460.5AppointedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
24 Feb 200560.7InstalledBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
21 Apr 200964.8AppointedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
10 Jun 200964.9InstalledArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert James Carlson:
Archbishop Robert James Carlson (born ) Archbishop of Saint Louis

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Louis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013