Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Edward Gullickson

Apostolic Nuncio to Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Polymartium

Apostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1950 BornSioux Falls
27 Jun 197625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Polymartium
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahamas, Antilles
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominica, Antilles
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Kitts and Nevis, Antilles
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Lucia, Antilles
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
2 Oct 200454.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Antilles
11 Nov 200454.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Polymartium
15 Dec 200454.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda, Antilles
15 Dec 200454.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Barbados, Antilles
15 Dec 200454.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jamaica, Antilles
15 Dec 200454.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guyana, Antilles
15 Dec 200454.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Suriname, Antilles
20 Dec 200454.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Grenada, Antilles
21 May 201160.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ukraine
5 Sep 201565.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
5 Sep 201565.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein

MicroData Summary for Thomas Edward Gullickson:
Archbishop Thomas Edward Gullickson (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Switzerland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Switzerland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,714
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015