Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Delegation to Antilles | |||
7 December 1925 | Established | Delegation to Antilles | |
11 September 1935 | Established | Delegation to Antilles | Nunciature to Cuba |
10 August 1938 | Suppressed | Delegation to Antilles (suppressed) | Nunciature to Cuba (Jamaica with its annexed territories and British Honduras)
Nunciature to Haiti (Rest of the Lesser Antilles and Puerto Rico) Nunciature to Venezuela (Barbados and the islands of Venezuela) |
Delegation to Antilles | |||
19 March 1975 | Established | Delegation to Antilles |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 21 Oct 2023 |
✠