Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fortunatus Nwachukwu

Apostolic Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Titular Archbishop of Aquaviva

Apostolic Delegate to Antilles

Apostolic Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda

Apostolic Nuncio to Barbados

Apostolic Nuncio to Bahamas

Apostolic Nuncio to Dominica

Apostolic Nuncio to Grenada

Apostolic Nuncio to Guyana

Apostolic Nuncio to Jamaica

Apostolic Nuncio to Saint Kitts and Nevis

Apostolic Nuncio to Saint Lucia

Apostolic Nuncio to Suriname

Apostolic Nuncio to Saint Vincent and Grenadines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1960 Born
17 Jun 198424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Umuahia, Nigeria
2 Apr 199029.8IncardinatedPriest of Aba, Nigeria
12 Nov 201252.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
12 Nov 201252.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquaviva
6 Jan 201352.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aquaviva
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Barbados, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominica, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jamaica, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Kitts and Nevis, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guyana, Antilles
4 Nov 201757.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Antilles
27 Feb 201857.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Lucia, Antilles
27 Feb 201857.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Grenada, Antilles
27 Feb 201857.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahamas, Antilles
9 Mar 201857.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Fortunatus Nwachukwu (VIAF: 89629338)
Archbishop Fortunatus Nwachukwu (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Trinidad and Tobago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNtigha
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Trinidad and Tobago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2012
  • c34: CB, 3 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,625
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast