Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Gogo Nwedo, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Umuahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1912²BornOguta
29 Jul 194533.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
19 Feb 195947.1AppointedBishop of Umuahia, Nigeria
17 May 195947.4Ordained BishopBishop of Umuahia, Nigeria
2 Apr 199078.3RetiredBishop of Umuahia, Nigeria
12 Feb 200088.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Umuahia, Nigeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Gogo Nwedo:
Bishop Anthony Gogo Nwedo C.S.Sp. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Umuahia

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 43
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013