Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Onitsha

Archidioecesis Onitshanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Valerian Okeke, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 April 1950
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 2,968 (1,146 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.onitsha-archdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 411, Onitsha, Anambra State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (046)41.04.44
  • Fax: 46.29.63

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}
25 July 1889ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin Prefecture Apostolic of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}
16 April 1920ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Onitsha-Owerri
9 July 1934Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Onitsha-Owerri
Vicariate Apostolic of Onitsha
12 February 1948SplitVicariate Apostolic of Onitsha-Owerri Vicariate Apostolic of Onitsha
Vicariate Apostolic of Owerri
Archdiocese of Onitsha
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Onitsha Archdiocese of Onitsha
12 November 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Onitsha Diocese of Enugu (erected)
10 November 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Onitsha Diocese of Awka (erected)
9 November 2001Territory LostArchdiocese of Onitsha Diocese of Nnewi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Onitsha
1950139,3901,250,00011.2%58531111,25540ap1951
1970380,0001,291,80029.4%3515507,60015434ap1971
1980375,000960,00039.1%5013635,952389134ap1981
1990754,4981,174,74464.2%111261375,5078222866ap1991
19991,426,5592,173,53665.6%256372934,868116357111ap2000
20001,543,2132,260,20968.3%243372805,511128449113ap2001
20011,558,714.0%26723290013243668ap2002*
20021,072,1271,608,19066.7%243222654,0457741275ap2003
20031,094,8731,648,39566.4%261282893,78810942077ap2004
20041,373,6602,060,49066.7%265342994,59411941085ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013