Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph (Ignatius) Shanahan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1871BornGlenkeen, Ireland
10 Apr 189826.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 Apr 190028.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
20 Sep 190534.3AppointedPrefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria
22 Apr 192048.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
22 Apr 192048.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}
6 Jun 192049.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
21 May 193160.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}
25 Dec 194372.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}

MicroData Summary for Joseph (Ignatius) Shanahan:
Bishop Joseph (Ignatius) Shanahan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 33
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013