Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel-Auguste-Marie Grandin, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bangui

Titular Bishop of Furnos Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1885BornBeaulandais, France
28 Oct 191227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
2 May 192843.3AppointedPrefect of Oubangui Chari, Central African Republic
2 Dec 193752.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
2 Dec 193752.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Oubangui Chari, Central African Republic
18 Jan 193853.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
28 May 194055.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bangui, Central African Republic
4 Aug 194762.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Bangui, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Marcel-Auguste-Marie Grandin:
Bishop Marcel-Auguste-Marie Grandin C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bangui

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013