Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Pierre Cardinal Boyer

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1829BornParay le Monial
23 Dec 185425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
12 Jun 187848.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Clermont, France
15 Jul 187849.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Clermont, France
15 Jul 187849.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
24 Aug 187849.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
24 Dec 187950.4SucceededBishop of Clermont, France
26 Nov 189263.3SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
19 Jan 189363.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
14 Mar 189363.6InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
29 Nov 189566.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 189666.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
16 Dec 189667.4DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Boyer:
Cardinal Jean-Pierre Boyer (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 150, and Page 208
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 266, and Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013