Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie Belmont

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1838Born
23 Dec 186527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
3 Jan 189354.9SelectedBishop of Clermont, France
19 Jan 189354.9ConfirmedBishop of Clermont, France
20 Mar 189355.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
28 Mar 189355.1InstalledBishop of Clermont, France
19 Mar 192183.1DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Belmont (VIAF: 311376605)
Bishop Pierre-Marie Belmont (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017