Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Julien Meirieu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Digne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1800Born
12 Jun 182423.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 184847.8SelectedBishop of Digne, France
11 Dec 184848.0ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
24 Feb 184948.2Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
Jan 1880³79.1RetiredBishop of Digne, France
9 Jul 188483.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Digne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Julien Meirieu (VIAF: 261193971)
Bishop Marie-Julien Meirieu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Digne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Gilles-du-Gard

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017