Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Marie-Anatole Cardinal de Rovérié de Cabrières

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1830Born
24 Sep 185323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nîmes, France
27 Dec 187343.3SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
16 Jan 187443.3ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
19 Mar 187443.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
27 Nov 191181.2Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191181.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
21 Dec 192191.3DiedBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie-Anatole de Rovérié de Cabrières (VIAF: 64036321)
François-Marie-Anatole Cardinal de Rovérié de Cabrières (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaucaire, Diocese of Nîmes
Ordained PriestBishop's, Chapel, Nîmes, Diocese of Nîmes
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nîmes, Diocese of Nîmes
Death PlaceMontpellier, Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
Buried Place (Original)St. Vincent de Paul Chapel, Cathedral, Montpellier, Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 47.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 17
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Nov 1911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017