Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis-Antoine-Alfred Gilly

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1833Born
22 Dec 185522.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 188955.9SelectedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
27 May 188956.0ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
21 Jul 188956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
6 Jan 189662.6DiedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis-Antoine-Alfred Gilly (VIAF: 170237926)
Bishop Jean-Louis-Antoine-Alfred Gilly (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnduze
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nîmes, Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017