Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Pierre-François Cotton

Deceased

Bishop of Valence, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1825Born
22 Jul 184923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Grenoble, France
19 Jan 187549.1SelectedBishop of Valence, France
15 Mar 187549.2ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
1 May 187549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
25 Sep 190579.8DiedBishop of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Pierre-François Cotton (VIAF: 31987816)
Bishop Charles-Pierre-François Cotton (born , died ) Bishop of Valence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Siméon-de-Bressieux
Ordained BishopCathedral, Grenoble, Diocese of Grenoble

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 579
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017