Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Simon-Henri Colomb

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1843BornValence
3 Apr 186623.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 189653.2SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
25 Jun 189653.2ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
8 Sep 189653.4Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
9 Feb 189854.9DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Simon-Henri Colomb:
Bishop Marie-Simon-Henri Colomb (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013