Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolphe-Josué-Frédéric Fiard

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1821BornLens-Lestang
13 Jul 184523.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 188159.9SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
18 Nov 188159.9ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
25 Jan 188260.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
10 Jan 190886.1DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Adolphe-Josué-Frédéric Fiard:
Bishop Adolphe-Josué-Frédéric Fiard (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013