Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred-François Fleury-Hottot

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1831Born
17 May 185624.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 188553.2SelectedBishop of Digne, France
27 Mar 188553.4ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
26 May 188553.5Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
2 May 188755.5SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
26 May 188755.5ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
10 Aug 188957.7DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

MicroData Summary for Alfred-François Fleury-Hottot (VIAF: 170942576)
Bishop Alfred-François Fleury-Hottot (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Germain-en-Laye
Ordained BishopCathedral, Digne, Diocese of Digne

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 138, and Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017