Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Maréchal

Deceased

Bishop of Laval, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1838Born
6 Jul 186223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
2 May 188748.5SelectedBishop of Laval, France
26 May 188748.6ConfirmedBishop of Laval, France
25 Jul 188748.7Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
21 Sep 188748.9DiedBishop of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Victor Maréchal
Bishop Victor Maréchal (born , died ) Bishop of Laval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConflans-en-Jarnissy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Death PlaceLaval, Diocese of Laval

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 579
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018