Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Antoine-Paul Goux

Deceased

Bishop of Versailles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1827Born
10 Sep 185124.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 187750.3SelectedBishop of Versailles, France
21 Sep 187750.5ConfirmedBishop of Versailles, France
14 Nov 187750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Versailles, France
29 Apr 190477.1DiedBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Antoine-Paul Goux (VIAF: 89024173)
Bishop Pierre-Antoine-Paul Goux (born , died ) Bishop of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)
Ordained BishopS. Sernin, Toulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 588
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017