Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augusto Bonetti, C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Turkey

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1831Born
1859¹27.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 May 188553.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
12 Jul 188554.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
6 May 188755.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
6 May 188755.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
19 Aug 190473.2DiedApostolic Delegate to Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augusto Bonetti
Archbishop Augusto Bonetti C.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Turkey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurialdo, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy
Ordained BishopLazaristes, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 182, and Page 436
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017