Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Raffaele Francesco Marengo, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1842BornIstanbul
10 Jun 186522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Mar 190461.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
8 Mar 190461.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Titopolis
17 Apr 190461.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Titopolis
25 Jul 190461.7SucceededArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
12 May 190966.5DiedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Domenico Raffaele Francesco Marengo:
Archbishop Domenico Raffaele Francesco Marengo O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne)

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013