Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonios Delenda

Deceased

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

Apostolic Delegate to Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1860Born
12 Feb 189838.1AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
1 May 189838.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
29 Apr 190040.3AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
22 Aug 190040.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Greece
10 Sep 191151.6DiedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Antonios Delenda
Archbishop Antonios Delenda (born , died ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantorino, Diocese of Santorini {Thira}
Ordained BishopSt. Denis, Cathedral, Athēnai, Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 225
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1898, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017