Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Carlo di Mento

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1845Born
1869²23.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 189953.6AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
25 Jul 189953.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
21 Sep 190458.9DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Carlo di Mento (VIAF: 88992060)
Bishop Francesco Carlo di Mento (born , died ) Bishop of Tinos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorfu, Archdiocese of Corf¨
Ordained BishopCollege de Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,931
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 554
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,592
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1899, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017