Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Darmanin

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1843BornCorf¨
18 Jun 190158.4AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
8 Sep 190158.7Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
4 Mar 191269.1AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
17 Feb 191976.1DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

MicroData Summary for Domenico Darmanin:
Archbishop Domenico Darmanin (born , died ) Archbishop of Corf¨

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 532
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1901, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013