Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Maria de Angelis, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

Apostolic Administrator of Naxos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1848Born
8 Dec 186416.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
14 Mar 187122.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
10 May 189546.5AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
10 May 189546.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Naxos, Greece
14 Jul 189546.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
28 Mar 190051.4DiedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria de Angelis
Archbishop Gaetano Maria de Angelis O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastro dei Volsci, Diocese of Veroli, Italy
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017