Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Giuseppe (Nicolae Iosif) Camilli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Iaşi, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1840Born
16 Sep 188141.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
4 Dec 188141.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
27 Jun 188444.1AppointedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
6 May 189454.0ResignedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
25 Feb 189655.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
27 Mar 190160.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia
30 Aug 190464.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Iaşi, Romania
12 Jan 191675.7ResignedBishop of Iaşi, Romania

MicroData Summary for Nicola Giuseppe (Nicolae Iosif) Camilli (VIAF: 89474077)
Archbishop Nicola Giuseppe (Nicolae Iosif) Camilli O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Iaşi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterubbiano, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Ordained BishopXII Apostles, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 279, and Page 316
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 396, and Page 558
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017