Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolo Zimarino

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1847Born
12 Apr 187326.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 189548.7AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
1 Dec 189548.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
6 Dec 190659.8AppointedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
15 May 192073.2DiedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicolo Zimarino
Bishop Nicolo Zimarino (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasalbordino
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 333
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017