Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Maria Andreoli

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1850Born
12 Apr 187322.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 189646.2AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
6 Dec 189646.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
20 Dec 191161.2AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
10 Nov 192373.1DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Andreoli (VIAF: 88982889)
Bishop Alfonso Maria Andreoli (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePergola
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017