Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sante Mei

Deceased

Bishop of Modigliana, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1831Born
23 Sep 185422.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 189564.0AppointedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
1 Dec 189564.0Ordained BishopBishop of Modigliana, Italy
16 Dec 190776.1ResignedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
16 Dec 190776.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia
23 May 190977.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sante Mei
Bishop Sante Mei (born , died ) Bishop of Modigliana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagli, Diocese of Cagli e Pergola
Ordained BishopXII Apostres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017