Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Fiore

Deceased

Bishop of Cuneo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1853Born
7 Jun 187319.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 189542.0AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
1 Dec 189542.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
6 Sep 189642.7InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
19 Jan 191460.1DiedBishop of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Fiore
Bishop Andrea Fiore (born , died ) Bishop of Cuneo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmagnola
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017