Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonaventura Maria Soldatich, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Serdica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1827BornCres
21 Dec 185023.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 185325.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 Jul 189567.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
4 Aug 189567.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serdica
29 Nov 189568.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Serdica

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Maria Soldatich:
Archbishop Bonaventura Maria Soldatich O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Serdica

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 502

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013