Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Bianchi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Apostolic Administrator of Subiaco

Pro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1817Born
15 Oct 186446.9AppointedOfficial to Switzerland
14 Mar 186850.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
Apr 1874³56.3ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
10 Oct 187456.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
1 Nov 187456.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
13 Nov 187456.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
15 May 187759.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
19 Sep 187961.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
25 Sep 188264.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Sep 188264.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
15 Mar 188365.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
15 Nov 188769.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
14 Mar 188971.3AppointedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary
24 May 188971.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
23 Sep 188971.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Subiaco, Italy
1891²73.1ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
22 Jan 189779.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Bianchi (VIAF: 25428964)
Angelo Cardinal Bianchi (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Family's Tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 398, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 Sep 1882
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 53
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 56, and Page 185, and Page 238
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jun 2018

Quantcast