Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio María Cardinal Cascajares y Azara

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1834BornCalanda
23 Feb 186127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Mar 188248.1AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
27 Mar 188248.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
4 Jun 188248.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
27 Mar 188450.1AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
14 Dec 189157.8SelectedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
17 Dec 189157.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
7 Apr 189258.1InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
29 Nov 189561.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 189662.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
24 Mar 189864.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
18 Apr 190167.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Jul 190167.4DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Cascajares y Azara:
Cardinal Antonio María Cascajares y Azara (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
  • a cardinal for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 170
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 250, and Page 580
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 46, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013