Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Ciriaco María Cardinal Sancha y Hervás

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1833BornQuintana del Pidio
27 Jun 185825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Osma, Spain
28 Jan 187642.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Jan 187642.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
12 Mar 187642.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
29 Dec 188148.5SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
27 Mar 188248.8ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
10 Jun 188653.0AppointedBishop of Madrid, Spain
11 Jul 189259.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
14 Nov 189259.4InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
18 May 189460.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 189562.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
24 Mar 189864.8AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
24 Mar 189864.8AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
26 Feb 190975.7DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
18 Oct 2009Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Ciriaco María Sancha y Hervás:
Bl. Ciriaco María Cardinal Sancha y Hervás (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
  • a cardinal for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 70, and Page 118
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 373, and Page 558
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 579, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1894
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 45, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 4 Mar 2014