Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Horcos y San Martín, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1807Born
May 1831³24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Aug 185245.3SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
27 Sep 185245.4ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
30 Jan 185345.8Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
13 Jan 186153.7DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Horcos y San Martín
Bishop Vicente Horcos y San Martín O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHornos de Moncalvillo
Ordained BishopS. Marc, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,172
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,422
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 432
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 162, Number 888
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017