Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Proceso Pozuelo y Herrero

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1828BornPozoblanco
21 May 185324.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 187749.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ceuta, Spain
26 Jun 187749.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
6 Jan 187849.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
3 Feb 187950.6SelectedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
28 Feb 187950.7ConfirmedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
26 Jun 189062.0AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
24 Mar 189869.7AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
23 Mar 191384.7DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Proceso Pozuelo y Herrero:
Bishop José Proceso Pozuelo y Herrero (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 110, and Page 177
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 226, and Page 509
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 513

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013