Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José López Mendoza y García, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1848Born
4 Jun 187224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1 Jun 189143.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
24 Aug 189143.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
14 Dec 189951.8AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
31 Jan 192374.9DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José López Mendoza y García (VIAF: 87045714)
Bishop José López Mendoza y García O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrías, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Basilica, Escurial

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 312, and Page 436
  • op/c1: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,891, Number 36
  • ob/c24: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast