Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro María Lagüera y Menezo

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1817BornMeruelo
16 Nov 186144.2SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
23 Dec 186144.3ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
1 Jun 186244.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
Dec 1892³75.2DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro María Lagüera y Menezo:
Bishop Pedro María Lagüera y Menezo (born ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 432
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 170, Number 934

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014