Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bienvenido Monzón y Martín

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1820BornCamarillas, Spain
1846¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 186141.0SelectedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
7 Apr 186241.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
25 May 186241.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
29 Aug 186544.7SelectedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
8 Jun 186645.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
27 Mar 188564.3AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
10 Aug 188564.7DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bienvenido Monzón y Martín:
Archbishop Bienvenido Monzón y Martín (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 249, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 309
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 169, Number 933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013