Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Esteban José Pérez Fernández

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1799Born
12 Jun 186565.8SelectedBishop of Coria, Spain
25 Sep 186566.0ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
4 Mar 186666.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
30 May 186868.7SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
22 Jun 186868.8ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
16 Jan 187474.4AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
17 May 187575.7SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Málaga, Spain
5 Jul 187575.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Málaga, Spain
8 Oct 187879.1DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Esteban José Pérez Fernández
Archbishop Esteban José Pérez Fernández (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJorairatar, Archdiocese of Granada
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193, and Page 361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 172, Number 950
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018