Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio García y Fernández

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1834Born
1859¹24.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 187641.8SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
3 Apr 187641.9ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
1 Oct 187642.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
5 Feb 189055.7DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio García y Fernández
Bishop Antonio García y Fernández (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedina de Pomar, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 509
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 46, Number 39
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018