Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Gómez-Salazar y Lucio-Villegas

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1824Born
10 Apr 185227.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 187551.1SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
17 Sep 187551.2ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
19 Mar 187651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
31 Dec 187854.5ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
28 Feb 187954.7AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
10 Jun 188661.9AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
14 Jun 189369.0DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Gómez-Salazar y Lucio-Villegas (VIAF: 87011256)
Archbishop Manuel Gómez-Salazar y Lucio-Villegas (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArijas, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopAugustins Recollects, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 163, and Page 361
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 510
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 45, Number 33
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017