Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Narciso Martínez Izquierdo

Deceased

Bishop of Madrid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1830Born
11 Apr 185726.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 187443.2AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
31 Jan 187544.2Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
27 Mar 188554.4AppointedBishop of Madrid, Spain
19 Apr 188655.4DiedBishop of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Narciso Martínez Izquierdo (VIAF: 22091761)
Bishop Narciso Martínez Izquierdo (born , died ) Bishop of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRueda de la Sierra
Ordained BishopIncarnation, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 372, and Page 491
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 41, Number 10
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017