Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martíno García y Alcocer, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cebu, Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Bostra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1842Born
7 Jun 188643.5AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
26 Sep 188643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
17 Jul 190360.6ResignedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
30 Jul 190461.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
20 May 192683.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Martíno García y Alcocer
Archbishop Martíno García y Alcocer O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbalate de Zorita, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopAssomption, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 417
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017