Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cebu

Archidioecesis Nominis Iesu o Caebuana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jose Serofia Palma, Archbishop
  • Oscar Jaime Llaneta Florencio, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Dennis Cabanada Villarojo, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Emilio Layon Bataclan, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Antonio Racelis Rañola, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 April 1934
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 5,088 (1,965 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Chancery, Cardinal Rosales Pastoral Center, Cor. P. Gomez and P. Burgos St., 6000 Cebu City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (032)254.1861; 253.0123
  • Fax: 253-0123

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cebu
14 August 1595ErectedDiocese of Manila Diocese of Nueva Caceres (erected)
Diocese of Cebu (erected)
Diocese of Nueva Segovia (erected)
27 May 1865Territory LostDiocese of Cebu Diocese of Jaro (erected)
17 September 1902Territory LostDiocese of Cebu Prefecture Apostolic of Marianne Islands (erected)
10 April 1910Territory LostDiocese of Cebu (Provinces of Samar and Leyte) Diocese of Calbayog (erected)
10 April 1910Territory LostDiocese of Cebu
Diocese of Jaro
Diocese of Zamboanga (erected)
15 July 1932Territory LostDiocese of Cebu
Diocese of Jaro
Diocese of Bacolod (erected)
Archdiocese of Cebu
28 April 1934ElevatedDiocese of Cebu Archdiocese of Cebu
8 November 1941Territory LostArchdiocese of Cebu Diocese of Tagbilaran (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cebu
19501,112,2641,122,13299.1%74601348,300598764ap1951
19581,139,0001,169,08197.4%103851886,05810518971ap1960
19701,733,0771,810,00095.8%1381302686,46614930789ap1971
19801,998,2092,326,00085.9%1471342817,111190426105ap1981
19902,285,0002,570,00088.9%1931383316,903314528119ap1991
19992,733,2903,159,64886.5%2652375025,444417818135ap2000
20002,787,9563,222,84186.5%2752265015,564465879136ap2001
20012,815,8363,255,07086.5%2772124895,758471988137ap2002
20022,843,9943,287,62186.5%2832865694,998556990138ap2003
20032,872,4343,320,49786.5%2932995924,852641995138ap2004
20043,268,0813,652,54689.5%2992905895,548607927138ap2005
20063,415,0003,789,00090.1%2924467384,6277441,020137ap2007
20134,079,7384,609,59088.5%3362776136,65511,0781,144145ap2014
20164,299,7794,874,96188.2%3392736127,0251,095977165ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 22 May 2018

Quantcast