Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santos Gómez Marañón, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1763BornValladolid
26 Jul 182965.7SelectedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
28 Sep 182965.9ConfirmedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
28 Oct 183067.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
23 Oct 184077.0DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Santos Gómez Marañón:
Bishop Santos Gómez Marañón O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Cebu

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 147, Number 799

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013