Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Antonio Zulaibar y Aldape, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1753Born
26 Mar 180450.7AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
14 Jul 180552.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
4 Apr 182470.7DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Zulaibar y Aldape
Archbishop Juan Antonio Zulaibar y Aldape O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeánuri, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 125, Number 667
  • ln: CB, 23 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast