Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo García y Hernández (Fernandez Perdigon), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres

Note/Previous Titular See: (de la Inmaculada Concepción)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1752BornEl Perdigón, Spain
1777¹24.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Sep 181664.5AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
28 Oct 181765.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
9 Oct 182977.5DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo García y Hernández (Fernandez Perdigon):
Bishop Bernardo García y Hernández (Fernandez Perdigon) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,087
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 123
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 136, Number 733

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015