Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Collantes, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1746Born
15 Dec 178842.2AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
28 Oct 179044.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
23 Jul 180861.8DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Domingo Collantes
Bishop Domingo Collantes O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHerrín de Campos, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Francis, Manilla, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 108, Number 565
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 100, Number 8,626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Dec 2020

Quantcast